Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3306 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16712 Week
» 69728 Month
» 189255 Year
» 3216108 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1770 |
m/e |
04/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4770 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9549 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69549 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22626 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 04/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 12/09/1961 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34F |
Grantham |
4w/e |
11/06/1960 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
16/06/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1949 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1770 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22626 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4770 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9549 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69549 |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (34F) |
|
|
27/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
12/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69549 |
|
|