Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
893 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9563 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
69563 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
305 |
Works Number |
1623 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 11/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 22/04/1960 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
on |
01/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
65E |
Kipps |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/04/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1955 |
Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 893 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1623 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9563 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69563 |
|
|
01/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
09/1955 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
|
22/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69563 |
|
|