Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 177 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19088 Week
» 84042 Month
» 286706 Year
» 3313559 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2662 |
m/e |
10/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9568 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69568 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3691 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 10/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
6w/e |
09/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1945 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Waiting Works) |
Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. |
SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 |
Worcester Works (Waiting Works) |
4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2662 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3691 |
|
|
05/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9568 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69568 |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
26/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69568 |
|
|