Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 941 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14347 Week
» 67363 Month
» 186890 Year
» 3213743 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2676 |
m/e |
03/1929 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9582 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69582 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3705 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 03/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/09/1960 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1929 |
HAT |
|
Hatfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34E |
|
New England |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/09/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/09/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1946 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2676 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3705 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9582 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69582 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
26/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69582 |
|
|