Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2683 |
m/e |
10/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9589 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69589 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2221 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 10/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/03/1960 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1928 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/03/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1949 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/04/1946 |
Midland Section |
4825 has been fitted with a self-cleaning smoke-box (15/4). 2683 (26A) was noted at Wellingborough, running light, on 20/3. An interesting working for which Bedford shed is responsible is a trip to Gloucester. The route is via Northampton and Stratford, and the locomotive, usually a 3F, is due out at 3 a.m, and does not re-turn until late at night. |
SLS/194605 |
24/11/1945 |
Willesden |
No. 28786, one of the last survivors of the L.N.W. 19in. goods worked a goods train from Willesden on 24/11/45. This is the first known appearance of one of these engines in London for many years. |
SLS/194605 |
30/06/1950 |
Special Trains |
Two private specials from King's Cross to Clacton last spring went by way of the connecting link between the Enfield-Hertford line at Bounds Green Box and the Palace Gates branch, reaching the main line at Stratford. The first train consisted of eleven Pullmans hauled by.'N.2' Nos. 69576 an 69589 through Wood Green and over the flying junction to Bounds Green, near Bowes Park station: 'B.1' Nos. 61361 an 61363 then took over at the other end for the main journey. The second special was formed of eight coaches including two dining-cars: it was brought out from King's Cross by 'N.2' No. 9495, and taken forward similarly over the unusual route by 'B.17' No. 61606 Audley End. |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2683 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2221 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9589 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69589 |
|
|
07/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69589 |
|
|