Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3328 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17371 Week
» 82325 Month
» 284989 Year
» 3311842 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2684 |
m/e |
11/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9590 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69590 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2222 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 11/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/06/1957 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1948 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2684 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2222 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9590 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69590 |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
03/06/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69590 |
|
|