Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 471 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19382 Week
» 84336 Month
» 287000 Year
» 3313853 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
519 |
m/e |
09/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5519 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9254 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69254 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3553 |
To Service |
During 09/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/05/1956 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1893 |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
LIVLMR |
|
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
6E |
|
Wrexham Rhosddu |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/05/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GOR |
Gorton |
w/e |
08/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
LIVLMR |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
LOAN |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/04/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1933 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 519 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3553 |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5519 |
|
|
08/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9254 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69254 |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
26/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69254 |
|
|