Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17173 Week
» 70189 Month
» 189716 Year
» 3216569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
524 |
m/e |
10/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5524 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9258 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69258 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3558 |
To Service |
During 10/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 10/09/1960 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 524 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3558 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5524 |
|
|
04/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9258 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brunswick (LIV) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69258 |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69258 |
|
|