Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1432 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14838 Week
» 67854 Month
» 187381 Year
» 3214234 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
539 |
m/e |
02/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5539 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9272 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
69272 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3572 |
To Service |
During 02/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/05/1956 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1894 |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
LIVLMR |
|
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/05/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GOR |
Gorton |
w/e |
08/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
LIVLMR |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/04/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1926 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 539 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3572 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5539 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9272 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69272 |
|
|
26/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69272 |
|
|