Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
202A |
m/e |
10/1896 |
Great Central Railway (Renum) |
21 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5021 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9294 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69294 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 02/10/1959 |
Service Life |
63 yrs , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1933 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 202 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
10/1900 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 21 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5021 |
|
|
12/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9294 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69294 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
02/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69294 |
|
|