|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1899 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 900 Built at Gorton Works |
||
01/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5900 | ||
03/1932 | Modification | Modification: Converted to N5/2 | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9324 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69324 | ||
08/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
23/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
08/11/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69324 |