Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 342 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18145 Week
» 71161 Month
» 190688 Year
» 3217541 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
929 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5929 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9353 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69353 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4189 |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/11/1955 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GOR |
Gorton |
9w/e |
31/03/1946 |
LOAN |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
on |
18/12/1949 |
EXLOAN |
39A |
Gorton |
on |
09/07/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1933 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1950 |
Unreported renumberings |
The following locos have been reported as renumberd by observations, but whose changes have not been notified by the Eastern and North Eastern regions: 69353, 69674, 69719, 63719, 63951/4/5/6, an 69012/3; the latter pair of 'J.72's' were delivered in the 60000 series! |
SLS/195007 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 929 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4189 |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5929 |
|
|
08/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9353 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69353 |
|
|
14/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69353 |
|
|