Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 879 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1953 Week
» 27314 Month
» 260234 Year
» 1925610 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7993 y/e 1924
Great Eastern Railway 993E m/e 01/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9615 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 69615 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N701/1924
N7/4 (0-6-2T)06/1945
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1924
Withdrawal Mon 12/09/1960
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1924
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
STR   Stratford w/e 16/04/1949
HAT   Hatfield w/e 03/12/1949
38A   Colwick w/e 05/05/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 19/05/1951
30A   Stratford 5w/e 24/04/1954
34B   Hornsey 3w/e 16/06/1956
32C   Lowestoft 5w/e 20/07/1957
30A   Stratford w/e 13/12/1958
31C   Kings Lynn w/e 01/08/1959
30A   Stratford w/e 15/08/1959
     Withdrawn on 12/09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC HAT Hatfield w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 05/05/1951
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 5w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   on 12/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7993    
01/1924 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 993
Built at Stratford Works
   
10/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 9615    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69615    
16/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT)    
05/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69615    

prev prev