Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 815 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1889 Week
» 27250 Month
» 260170 Year
» 1925546 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7997 y/e 1924
Great Eastern Railway 997E m/e 02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9619 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69619 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N702/1924
N7/4 (0-6-2T)02/1942
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number K89
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1924
Withdrawal Mon 16/02/1959
Service Life 35 yrs , 16 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1924
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
PKS   Parkeston Quay 4w/e 25/12/1948
30E   Colchester 5w/e 17/12/1955
30A   Stratford 5w/e 24/03/1956
31A   Cambridge 4w/e 16/02/1957
31C   Kings Lynn 5w/e 14/06/1958
30A   Stratford w/e 06/12/1958
     Withdrawn on 16/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   on 16/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1959 Stratford Works (Waiting cut up) Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7997    
02/1924 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 997
Built at Stratford Works
   
05/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9619    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
25/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69619    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
06/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69619    

prev prev