Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3465 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16871 Week
» 69887 Month
» 189414 Year
» 3216267 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7999 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Eastern Railway |
999E |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9621 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
69621 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
K89 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 03/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 11/09/1962 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1937 |
Condensers removed |
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7999 |
|
|
03/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 999 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
05/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9621 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69621 |
|
|
25/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69621 |
|
|