Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 242 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5642 Week
» 23694 Month
» 256614 Year
» 1921990 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 471 m/e 11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9629 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 69629 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/111/1925
N7/5 (0-6-2T)04/1956
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1925
Withdrawal Mon 29/08/1960
Service Life 34 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1925
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34B   Hornsey 5w/e 21/01/1956
34C   Hatfield w/e 28/03/1959
     Withdrawn on 29/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 18/04/1959
WDN   on 29/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 471
Built at Gorton Works
   
10/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9629    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69629    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
28/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
29/08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69629    

prev prev