Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 34 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4949 Week
» 16186 Month
» 249106 Year
» 1914482 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 475 m/e 12/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9631 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 69631 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/112/1925
N7/5 (0-6-2T)03/1955
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1925
Withdrawal Mon 23/01/1961
Service Life 35 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1925
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34C   Hatfield 5w/e 24/04/1954
34A   Kings Cross w/e 07/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 23/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 24/04/1954
WDN   on 23/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 475
Built at Gorton Works
   
06/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9631    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69631    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
23/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69631    

prev prev