Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 46 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 16198 Month
» 249118 Year
» 1914494 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 826 m/e 01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9632 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 69632 w/e 30/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/101/1926
N7/5 (0-6-2T)05/1943
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1926
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1926
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34A   Kings Cross w/e 07/01/1961
30A   Stratford w/e 22/04/1961
     Withdrawn on 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 13/05/1961
WDN   on 16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 826
Built at Gorton Works
   
10/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9632    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
30/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69632    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69632    

prev prev