Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 829 m/e 02/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9635 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 69635 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/102/1926
N7/5 (0-6-2T)02/1944
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1926
Withdrawal Mon 09/03/1959
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1926
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
PKS   Parkeston Quay w/e 16/04/1949
30A   Stratford 4w/e 09/08/1952
30A   Stratford 5w/e 23/08/1952
34C   Hatfield 4w/e 19/12/1953
     Withdrawn on 09/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 28/11/1953
WDN   on 09/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/08/1958 Peterborough MPD C12 67398 has been working the Stamford branch with the N5s and C12 67363 has arrived as spare; however N7s 69635/46 have replaced N5s and more are expected as the N5s are withdrawn. SLS/195810
02/04/1959 Stratford Works (Waiting cut up) Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 829
Built at Gorton Works
   
07/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9635    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69635    
16/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
09/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69635    

prev prev