Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 263 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5663 Week
» 23715 Month
» 256635 Year
» 1922011 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 832 m/e 04/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9637 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 69637 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/104/1926
N7/5 (0-6-2T)10/1955
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 04/1926
Withdrawal Tue 31/03/1959
Service Life 33 yrs

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1926
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 21/07/1951
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 3w/e 28/07/1951
30A   Stratford 4w/e 29/12/1951
34C   Hatfield 5w/e 24/04/1954
34B   Hornsey 5w/e 14/06/1958
     Withdrawn on 31/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 3w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 31/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1959 Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 832
Built at Gorton Works
   
07/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9637    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69637    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
28/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
31/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69637    

prev prev