Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 788 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1862 Week
» 27223 Month
» 260143 Year
» 1925519 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 833 m/e 04/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9638 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 69638 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/104/1926
N7/5 (0-6-2T)01/1950
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 04/1926
Withdrawal Tue 19/05/1959
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1926
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A   Colwick w/e 28/04/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 19/05/1951
34C   Hatfield w/e 10/11/1951
34A   Kings Cross 4w/e 21/08/1954
34C   Hatfield 4w/e 25/09/1954
     Withdrawn on 19/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 28/04/1951
ALLOC 34C Hatfield w/e 10/11/1951
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 11/09/1954
WDN   on 19/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 833
Built at Gorton Works
   
06/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9638    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69638    
28/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
10/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
21/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
19/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69638    

prev prev