Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1611 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15017 Week
» 68033 Month
» 187560 Year
» 3214413 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
834 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9639 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69639 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 05/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/01/1959 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1926 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
HAT |
|
Hatfield |
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/01/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HAT |
Hatfield |
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 834 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
06/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9639 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69639 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
05/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69639 |
|
|