Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 834 m/e 05/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9639 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 69639 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/105/1926
N7/5 (0-6-2T)01/1948
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 05/1926
Withdrawal Mon 05/01/1959
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1926
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HAT   Hatfield w/e 24/12/1949
     Withdrawn on 05/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HAT Hatfield w/e 24/12/1949
WDN   on 05/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 834
Built at Gorton Works
   
06/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9639    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69639    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT)    
05/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69639    

prev prev