Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 741 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1815 Week
» 27176 Month
» 260096 Year
» 1925472 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 838 m/e 06/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9641 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 69641 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/106/1926
N7/5 (0-6-2T)09/1952
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1926
Withdrawal Mon 01/12/1958
Service Life 32 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1926
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 01/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 01/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/03/1950 Stratford Works One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. SLS/195005
31/12/1958 Stratford Works (Stripping) Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. SLS/195902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 838
Built at Gorton Works
   
08/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9641    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69641    
01/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69641    

prev prev