Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 32 Online
» 806 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1880 Week
» 27241 Month
» 260161 Year
» 1925537 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 850 m/e 07/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9642 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 69642 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/107/1926
N7/5 (0-6-2T)03/1951
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1926
Withdrawal Thu 24/11/1960
Service Life 34 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1926
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C   Kings Lynn w/e 08/10/1950
31C   Kings Lynn 4w/e 21/10/1950
30A   Stratford on 29/10/1950
30A   Stratford 4w/e 25/11/1950
     Withdrawn on 24/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford on 29/10/1950
WDN   on 24/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 850
Built at Gorton Works
   
04/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9642    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69642    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
29/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69642    

prev prev