Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 818 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1892 Week
» 27253 Month
» 260173 Year
» 1925549 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 865 m/e 10/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9646 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 69646 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/110/1926
N7/5 (0-6-2T)05/1954
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1926
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 35 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1926
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/08/1946 Liverpool Street Station On. 22/8 'N.7' 9646 became derailed at the end of Platforms 3/4 in the evening rush hour, and the breakdown train was in charge of 7160. SLS/194701
09/08/1958 Peterborough MPD C12 67398 has been working the Stamford branch with the N5s and C12 67363 has arrived as spare; however N7s 69635/46 have replaced N5s and more are expected as the N5s are withdrawn. SLS/195810
30/04/1961 Stratford Works (Old Works) New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 865
Built at Gorton Works
   
10/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9646    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69646    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69646    

prev prev