Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 43 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4958 Week
» 16195 Month
» 249115 Year
» 1914491 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 867 m/e 11/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9648 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69648 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/111/1926
N7/5 (0-6-2T)05/1943
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1926
Withdrawal Mon 29/08/1960
Service Life 33 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1926
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34C   Hatfield 4w/e 20/09/1952
34C   Hatfield 4w/e 04/10/1952
     Withdrawn on 29/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   on 29/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 867
Built at Gorton Works
   
12/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9648    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69648    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
29/08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69648    

prev prev