Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 44 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4959 Week
» 16196 Month
» 249116 Year
» 1914492 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 868 m/e 12/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9649 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69649 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/112/1926
N7/5 (0-6-2T)02/1944
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1926
Withdrawal Mon 27/07/1959
Service Life 32 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1926
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
34C   Hatfield 4w/e 19/12/1953
     Withdrawn on 27/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 28/11/1953
WDN   on 27/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 868
Built at Gorton Works
   
04/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9649    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69649    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
27/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69649    

prev prev