Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 253 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5653 Week
» 23705 Month
» 256625 Year
» 1922001 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 873 m/e 02/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9651 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69651 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/102/1927
N7/5 (0-6-2T)12/1945
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1927
Withdrawal Fri 13/01/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A   Colwick w/e 28/04/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 19/05/1951
38B   Annesley 4w/e 29/12/1951
38B   Annesley 4w/e 19/01/1952
31A   Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1956
30A   Stratford 4w/e 13/09/1958
31C   Kings Lynn w/e 01/08/1959
30A   Stratford w/e 26/09/1959
30F   Parkeston Quay w/e 30/01/1960
30A   Stratford w/e 30/07/1960
30F   Parkeston Quay w/e 22/10/1960
30A   Stratford w/e 07/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 13/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 28/04/1951
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 06/08/1960
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   on 13/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1937 Condensers removed
10/1951 Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
10/1951 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 873
Built at Gorton Works
   
02/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9651    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69651    
28/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
10/1951 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
10/1951 Modification Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
13/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
30/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69651    

prev prev