Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 755 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1829 Week
» 27190 Month
» 260110 Year
» 1925486 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 907 m/e 10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9652 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69652 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/110/1925
N7/5 (0-6-2T)10/1945
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3897
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1925
Withdrawal Sun 04/12/1960
Service Life 35 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1925
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E   Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
30A   Stratford w/e 12/12/1959
     Withdrawn on 04/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 04/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 907
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3897
   
01/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9652    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69652    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69652    

prev prev