Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 913 m/e 10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9654 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69654 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/110/1925
N7/5 (0-6-2T)04/1951
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3899
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1925
Withdrawal Sun 04/12/1960
Service Life 35 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1925
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A   Colwick 4w/e 12/07/1952
38A   Colwick 4w/e 19/07/1952
34C   Hatfield 5w/e 24/04/1954
30A   Stratford w/e 06/02/1960
     Withdrawn on 04/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 04/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 913
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3899
   
02/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9654    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69654    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69654    

prev prev