Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 840 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1914 Week
» 27275 Month
» 260195 Year
» 1925571 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 918 m/e 10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9656 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69656 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/110/1925
N7/5 (0-6-2T)01/1948
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3901
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1925
Withdrawal Mon 10/04/1961
Service Life 35 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1925
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 10/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 10/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1938 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1961 Stratford Works (Works Yard) Old Works: D2202/3/16, D2950, D3496, 11157, 12132. Scrap Yard: 64698, 64767, 67726, 69681, 69721. Works Yard: D2214, D5047/94, D8405, 62015, 69656, 69702. Diesel Erecting Shop: D200/48, D5036/59/60/6/95, D5630/6/66, D5901/4, D8206, D8403/6. Erecting Shop Yard: D2575, D5040/1, D5903, DEPT33/44/5. Works Shunters: D2209/17, D2958, 12111. SLS/196105
30/04/1961 Stratford Works (Scrap Road) New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 918
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3901
   
02/1938 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9656    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69656    
10/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69656    

prev prev