Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 245 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5645 Week
» 23697 Month
» 256617 Year
» 1921993 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2633 m/e 11/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9673 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69673 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/211/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)02/1950
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1927
Withdrawal Sun 10/09/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E   Colchester 5w/e 21/03/1953
30F   Parkeston Quay w/e 07/11/1959
30A   Stratford w/e 30/01/1960
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 10/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2633
Built at Gorton Works
   
05/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9673    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69673    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69673    

prev prev