Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 236 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5636 Week
» 23688 Month
» 256608 Year
» 1921984 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2634 m/e 11/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9674 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69674 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/211/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)02/1951
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1927
Withdrawal Mon 12/06/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
LIN   Lincoln w/e 18/06/1949
LIN   Lincoln m/e 07/1949
40F   Boston m/e 06/05/1950
30A   Stratford 3w/e 31/05/1950
     Withdrawn on 12/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 18/06/1949
WDN   on 12/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1950 Unreported renumberings The following locos have been reported as renumberd by observations, but whose changes have not been notified by the Eastern and North Eastern regions: 69353, 69674, 69719, 63719, 63951/4/5/6, an 69012/3; the latter pair of 'J.72's' were delivered in the 60000 series! SLS/195007

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2634
Built at Gorton Works
   
07/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9674    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
18/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
06/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69674    
12/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69674    

prev prev