Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 870 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1944 Week
» 27305 Month
» 260225 Year
» 1925601 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2635 m/e 11/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9675 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69675 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/211/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)09/1946
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1927
Withdrawal Mon 26/06/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A   Stratford w/e 23/04/1950
30A   Stratford m/e 06/05/1950
30F   Parkeston Quay 4w/e 17/11/1956
30A   Stratford w/e 30/01/1960
     Withdrawn on 26/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1950
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 26/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2635
Built at Gorton Works
   
04/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9675    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69675    
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
26/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69675    

prev prev