Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 293 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5693 Week
» 23745 Month
» 256665 Year
» 1922041 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2636 m/e 12/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9676 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 69676 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/212/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)09/1946
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1927
Withdrawal Mon 16/02/1959
Service Life 31 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 16/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester on 19/04/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford on 07/06/1947
WDN   on 16/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1957 Bishops Stortford No transfers are recorded between Stratford and this shed (30C), its allocation at present being 65535/6, 67701/11/3/21/2/3, 69676, 69713. N7 69676 replaced 67738 which went to Lowestoft. SLS/195709
02/04/1959 Stratford Works (Waiting cut up) Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2636
Built at Gorton Works
   
10/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9676    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69676    
16/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69676    

prev prev