Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 276 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5676 Week
» 23728 Month
» 256648 Year
» 1922024 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2638 m/e 01/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9678 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69678 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/201/1928
N7/3 (0-6-2T)12/1943
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1928
Withdrawal Sun 10/09/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E   Colchester 4w/e 21/07/1951
30E   Colchester 3w/e 28/07/1951
30A   Stratford w/e 29/09/1951
30A   Stratford 4w/e 20/10/1951
30E   Colchester w/e 17/11/1951
34C   Hatfield 4w/e 20/09/1952
34C   Hatfield 4w/e 04/10/1952
30A   Stratford w/e 27/08/1960
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30E Colchester 3w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester w/e 17/11/1951
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 03/09/1960
WDN   on 10/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2638
Built at Gorton Works
   
11/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9678    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69678    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
28/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
27/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69678    

prev prev