Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 40 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4955 Week
» 16192 Month
» 249112 Year
» 1914488 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2646 m/e 07/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9686 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 69686 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/207/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)12/1943
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 309
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1927
Withdrawal Sun 10/09/1961
Service Life 34 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E   Colchester w/e 31/01/1959
30A   Stratford w/e 09/05/1959
30F   Parkeston Quay w/e 30/07/1960
30A   Stratford w/e 22/10/1960
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 5w/e 06/08/1960
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   on 10/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1937 Condensers removed
03/1939 Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2646
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 309
   
04/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
03/1939 Modification Modification: Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9686    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69686    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69686    

prev prev