Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2649 m/e 08/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9689 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 69689 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 312
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1927
Withdrawal Mon 25/03/1957
Service Life 29 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1927
HAT   Hatfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
NEA   Neasden m/e 07/1949
NEA   Neasden w/e 09/07/1949
34A   Kings Cross w/e 07/07/1951
34A   Kings Cross 4w/e 21/07/1951
38B   Annesley 4w/e 19/06/1954
32D   Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 19/03/1955
     Withdrawn on 25/03/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 26/03/1955
WDN   on 25/03/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1937 Condensers removed
06/1949 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2649
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 312
   
03/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9689    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69689    
06/1949 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
09/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
07/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
25/03/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69689    

prev prev