Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 46 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 16198 Month
» 249118 Year
» 1914494 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2650 m/e 08/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9690 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69690 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/208/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)01/1955
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 313
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1927
Withdrawal Fri 13/01/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1927
HAT   Hatfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
NEA   Neasden m/e 07/1949
NEA   Neasden w/e 09/07/1949
34A   Kings Cross w/e 15/09/1951
34A   Kings Cross 5w/e 22/09/1951
32A   Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 21/03/1953
32C   Lowestoft 3w/e 16/06/1956
31A   Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1956
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 16/08/1958
30A   Stratford w/e 18/04/1959
30F   Parkeston Quay w/e 30/01/1960
30A   Stratford w/e 07/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 13/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 13/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1935 Condensers removed
06/1949 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1961 Stratford Works (foundry) Steam locomotives-Old Works: 68633; waiting cut-up 67726, 68924; foundry 68612, 69690 SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2650
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 313
   
07/1935 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9690    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69690    
06/1949 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
09/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
16/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69690    

prev prev