Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 237 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5637 Week
» 23689 Month
» 256609 Year
» 1921985 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2652 m/e 08/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9692 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 69692 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/208/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)08/1944
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 315
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1927
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 35 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1927
HAT   Hatfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
NEA   Neasden m/e 07/1949
NEA   Neasden w/e 09/07/1949
34A   Kings Cross 4w/e 21/07/1951
34A   Kings Cross 3w/e 28/07/1951
38B   Annesley 4w/e 22/05/1954
30A   Stratford 4w/e 23/10/1954
38B   Annesley 6w/e 25/12/1954
31A   Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1956
30A   Stratford 4w/e 13/09/1958
34C   Hatfield w/e 04/04/1959
34A   Kings Cross w/e 07/01/1961
30A   Stratford w/e 15/04/1961
     Withdrawn on 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 3w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 13/05/1961
WDN   on 16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1937 Condensers removed
07/1949 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/03/1949 Altrincham Area The majority of the Grand National specials working over the C.L.C. section from Godley Junction to Irlam on 26/3, were worked by Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's. 'Director' Class 4-4-0 No. 2652 Edwin A. Beazley was noted banking a heavy coal train from Skelton Junction to West Timperley on 26/3. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2652
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 315
   
03/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9692    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69692    
07/1949 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
09/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
28/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
13/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
15/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69692    

prev prev