Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 851 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1925 Week
» 27286 Month
» 260206 Year
» 1925582 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2654 m/e 08/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9694 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 69694 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/208/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)11/1954
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 317
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1927
Withdrawal Thu 24/11/1960
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1927
HAT   Hatfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
LIN   Lincoln w/e 16/10/1948
BOS   Boston w/e 06/11/1948
HAT   Hatfield w/e 18/12/1948
NEA   Neasden w/e 27/08/1949
34A   Kings Cross 4w/e 21/07/1951
34A   Kings Cross 3w/e 28/07/1951
37A   Ardsley 4w/e 19/06/1954
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 23/10/1954
33B   Tilbury 4w/e 17/11/1956
31C   Kings Lynn 4w/e 08/03/1958
30A   Stratford w/e 23/07/1960
30F   Parkeston Quay w/e 22/10/1960
     Withdrawn on 24/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 16/10/1948
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 06/11/1948
ALLOC HAT Hatfield w/e 18/12/1948
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 27/08/1949
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 3w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 06/08/1960
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   on 24/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1937 Condensers removed
08/1949 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2654
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 317
   
09/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9694    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69694    
16/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
06/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
18/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT)    
08/1949 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
27/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
28/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
23/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
24/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69694    

prev prev