Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 748 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1822 Week
» 27183 Month
» 260103 Year
» 1925479 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2655 m/e 08/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9695 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69695 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 318
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1927
Withdrawal Mon 01/12/1958
Service Life 31 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1927
HAT   Hatfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38B   Annesley w/e 10/11/1951
37A   Ardsley 4w/e 22/05/1954
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 23/10/1954
33A   Plaistow 5w/e 21/01/1956
33B   Tilbury 4w/e 22/09/1956
30A   Stratford 4w/e 13/09/1958
     Withdrawn on 01/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 10/11/1951
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 06/09/1958
WDN   on 01/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1937 Condensers removed
10/1951 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2655
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 318
   
01/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9695    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69695    
10/1951 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
10/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
13/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69695    

prev prev