|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2656 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 319 |
||
04/1936 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9696 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) | ||
04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69696 | ||
11/1951 | Modification | Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted | ||
21/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
19/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
23/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
23/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) | ||
21/04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
17/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) | ||
19/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) | ||
07/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
15/04/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
27/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69696 |