Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 32 Online
» 811 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1885 Week
» 27246 Month
» 260166 Year
» 1925542 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2656 m/e 08/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9696 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 69696 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/208/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)07/1946
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 319
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1927
Withdrawal Thu 27/04/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1927
HAT   Hatfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A   Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 21/03/1953
37A   Ardsley 4w/e 19/06/1954
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 23/10/1954
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street 5w/e 23/07/1955
37B   Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 21/04/1956
32D   Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 17/11/1956
30A   Stratford 4w/e 19/10/1957
34C   Hatfield w/e 31/10/1959
34A   Kings Cross w/e 07/01/1961
30A   Stratford w/e 15/04/1961
     Withdrawn on 27/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   on 27/04/1961
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 13/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1936 Condensers removed
11/1951 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1959 Stratford Works (Old Works) Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2656
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 319
   
04/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9696    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69696    
11/1951 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
15/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69696    

prev prev