Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 284 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5684 Week
» 23736 Month
» 256656 Year
» 1922032 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2658 m/e 09/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9698 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69698 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/209/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)09/1950
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 321
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1927
Withdrawal Sun 10/09/1961
Service Life 34 yrs , 10 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1927
HAT   Hatfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
NEA   Neasden w/e 27/08/1949
34A   Kings Cross 4w/e 21/07/1951
37A   Ardsley 3w/e 28/07/1951
37A   Ardsley 4w/e 18/08/1951
34A   Kings Cross 5w/e 22/09/1951
32A   Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 24/07/1954
32D   Yarmouth South Town m/e 21/07/1956
33B   Tilbury 4w/e 20/10/1956
31C   Kings Lynn 4w/e 08/03/1958
34C   Hatfield w/e 07/03/1959
34A   Kings Cross w/e 07/01/1961
30A   Stratford w/e 15/04/1961
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEA Neasden w/e 27/08/1949
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 3w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross w/e 22/09/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 21/07/1956
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 13/05/1961
WDN   on 10/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1936 Condensers removed
08/1949 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2658
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 321
   
04/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9698    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69698    
08/1949 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
27/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
28/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
18/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
15/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69698    

prev prev