Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3086 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16492 Week
» 69508 Month
» 189035 Year
» 3215888 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2658 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9698 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69698 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
321 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 09/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
34 yrs , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1936 |
Condensers removed |
08/1949 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2658 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 321 |
|
|
04/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9698 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69698 |
|
|
08/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
18/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
21/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69698 |
|
|