Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 770 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1844 Week
» 27205 Month
» 260125 Year
» 1925501 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2659 m/e 09/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9699 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69699 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/209/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)12/1943
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 322
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1927
Withdrawal Thu 24/11/1960
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
IPS   Ipswich 4w/e 25/12/1948
30A   Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
30A   Stratford 3w/e 31/05/1950
     Withdrawn on 24/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
WDN   on 24/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1933 Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
02/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2659
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 322
   
09/1933 Modification Modification: Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector    
02/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9699    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69699    
25/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
14/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69699    

prev prev