|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2659 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 322 |
||
09/1933 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector | ||
02/1937 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9699 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69699 | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
14/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
31/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
24/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69699 |