Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 236 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5636 Week
» 23688 Month
» 256608 Year
» 1921984 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2661 m/e 09/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9701 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69701 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N7/209/1927
N7/3 (0-6-2T)10/1947
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 324
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1927
Withdrawal Sun 04/12/1960
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
IPS   Ipswich w/e 23/10/1948
30A   Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
30E   Colchester w/e 16/07/1950
30A   Stratford 4w/e 21/07/1951
30A   Stratford 3w/e 28/07/1951
     Withdrawn on 04/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 23/10/1948
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 30E Colchester w/e 16/07/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford 3w/e 28/07/1951
WDN   on 04/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1933 Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
09/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2661
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 324
   
07/1933 Modification Modification: Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector    
09/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9701    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
23/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
14/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69701    
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
28/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69701    

prev prev